NJ S664 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S929
Note: Carry Over of previous A2869
Note: Carry Over of previous A2869
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases amount of cigarette and other tobacco products tax revenues provided to New Jersey Commission on Cancer Research to $10 million; establishes dedicated, non-lapsing Cancer Research Fund.
Title
Increases amount of cigarette and other tobacco products tax revenues provided to New Jersey Commission on Cancer Research to $10 million; establishes dedicated, non-lapsing Cancer Research Fund.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S929 (Carry Over) 2023-02-13 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2869 (Carry Over) 2023-05-18 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A4677 (Same As) 2024-06-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A2869 (Carry Over) 2023-05-18 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A4677 (Same As) 2024-06-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S664 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S1000/664_I1.HTM |