NJ S784 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2457
Note: Carry Over of previous A3176
Note: Carry Over of previous A3176
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Deletes prior authorization requirements by certain insurers for accessing certain health care services.
Title
Deletes prior authorization requirements by certain insurers for accessing certain health care services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2457 (Carry Over) 2018-04-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A2474 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A3176 (Carry Over) 2018-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
A2474 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A3176 (Carry Over) 2018-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S784 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1000/784_I1.HTM |