NJ S835 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.175.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on January 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.175.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Enhances penalties for false incrimination and making fictitious reports.*
Title
Enhances penalties for false incrimination and making fictitious reports.*
Sponsors
Sen. Donald Norcross [D] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Rep. Celeste Riley [D] | Rep. Gilbert Wilson [D] |
Rep. Carmelo Garcia [D] | Rep. Joe Danielsen [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A1972 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-06-19 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2015, c.175. |
2015-12-03 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (61-0-0) |
2015-12-03 | Assembly | Substituted for A1972 (1R) |
2015-03-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-06-26 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2014-06-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2014-06-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1972 (Same As) 2015-12-03 - Substituted by S835 (1R)