NJ S938 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S915
Note: Carry Over of previous S915
Note: Carry Over of previous S915
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-19 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-12-19 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits certain portion of municipal development trust funds to be spent on housing affordability assistance to veterans.
Title
Permits certain portion of municipal development trust funds to be spent on housing affordability assistance to veterans.
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Connors [R] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Sen. Jennifer Beck [R] | Sen. Brian Stack [D] |
Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. Robert Gordon [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-15 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
2016-12-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2016-12-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S938 (Carry Over) 2016-12-19 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S915 (Carry Over) 2014-10-23 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A985 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S915 (Carry Over) 2014-10-23 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A985 (Same As) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2016/S938 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2016/S1000/938_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=S938 |