NJ SCR27 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR96
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR155
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR155
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Governor to reopen Hagedorn Gero-Psychiatric Hospital.
Title
Urges Governor to reopen Hagedorn Gero-Psychiatric Hospital.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR96 (Carry Over) 2018-04-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
ACR146 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee
ACR155 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
ACR146 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Aging and Senior Services Committee
ACR155 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/SCR27 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/SCR/27_I1.HTM |