NJ SCR96 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR27
Note: Carry Foward to future ACR146
Note: Carry Foward to future ACR146
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 26 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Governor to reopen Hagedorn Gero-Psychiatric Hospital.
Title
Urges Governor to reopen Hagedorn Gero-Psychiatric Hospital.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SCR96 (Carry Over) 2018-04-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
SCR96 (Carry Over) 2018-04-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
ACR155 (Same As) 2018-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
SCR96 (Carry Over) 2018-04-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
ACR155 (Same As) 2018-03-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/SCR96 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/SCR/96_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=SCR96 |