NJ SR23 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SR17
Note: Carry Over of previous SR22
Note: Carry Over of previous SR45
Note: Carry Over of previous AR92
Note: Carry Over of previous SR22
Note: Carry Over of previous SR45
Note: Carry Over of previous AR92
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges US Congress to pass "Born-Alive Abortion Survivors Protection Act."
Title
Urges US Congress to pass "Born-Alive Abortion Survivors Protection Act."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SR23 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SR22 (Carry Over) 2020-01-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SR45 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
AR92 (Carry Over) 2020-10-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
SR22 (Carry Over) 2020-01-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
SR45 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
AR92 (Carry Over) 2020-10-29 - Filed with Secretary of State
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/SR23 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/SR/23_I1.HTM |