NJ SR45 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future AR24
Note: Carry Foward to future SR23
Note: Carry Over of previous AR164
Note: Carry Over of previous SR94
Note: Carry Foward to future SR23
Note: Carry Over of previous AR164
Note: Carry Over of previous SR94
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Pending: Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expresses to Federal Energy Regulatory Commission opposition to proposed Northeast Supply Enhancement Project; urges consideration of certain alternative projects.
Title
Expresses to Federal Energy Regulatory Commission opposition to proposed Northeast Supply Enhancement Project; urges consideration of certain alternative projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SR45 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
SR45 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
AR21 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
AR164 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
SR94 (Carry Over) 2018-09-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
SR45 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
AR21 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee
AR164 (Carry Over) 2019-01-28 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
SR94 (Carry Over) 2018-09-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/SR45 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/SR/45_I1.HTM |