NM HB129 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-07 - [LD 16] Passed Senate (40-0) Signed by one or both houses (Mar.2) Ch.23.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 7 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-02-07 - [LD 16] Passed Senate (40-0) Signed by one or both houses (Mar.2) Ch.23.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Home school student program unit calculation
Title
Home school student program unit calculation
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Passed Senate (40-0) Signed by one or both houses (Mar.2) Ch.23. | |
2012-02-02 | [LD 13] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-27 | [LD 9] Referred to Senate Finance | |
2012-01-27 | [LD 9] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Referred to Senate Education | |
2012-01-20 | [LD 4] Assigned to Senate Education and then to Senate Finance | |
2012-01-27 | [LD 9] Passed House (55-5) | |
2012-01-24 | [LD 6] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-18 | [LD 2] Referred to House Education |