NM HB129 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-07 - [LD 20] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on January 31 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-07 - [LD 20] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Homeowner Disclosure Certificate Fee Cap
Title
Homeowner Disclosure Certificate Fee Cap
Sponsors
Roll Calls
House - House Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-07 | Senate | [LD 20] Action postponed indefinitely |
2016-02-07 | Senate | [LD 20] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-02-03 | Senate | [LD 16] Referred to Senate Public Affairs |
2016-01-31 | House | [LD 13] Passed House (68-0) |
2016-01-30 | House | [LD 12] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-26 | House | [LD 8] Referred to House Judiciary |
2016-01-26 | House | [LD 8] Do pass committee report adopted |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Referred to House Government, Elections & Indian Affairs |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Assigned to House Government, Elections & Indian Affairs and then to House Judiciary |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Assigned to |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Printed |
2016-01-22 | House | [LD 4] Withdrawn from committee or daily calendar for subsequent action |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Referred to House Rules & Order of Business |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] Not Printed |
2016-01-19 | House | [LD 1] House Pre-file |