NM HB175 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] SJC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 22 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-11 - [LD 18] SJC API.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Uniform debt management services act
Title
Uniform debt management services act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-11 | [LD 18] SJC API. | |
2010-02-12 | [LD 19] fl/a- PASSED/H (66-0) | |
2010-02-09 | [LD 16] DNP-CS/DP | |
2010-02-05 | [LD 14] DP-HJC | |
2010-01-22 | [LD 4] HBIC/HJC-HBIC |