NM HB408 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 63
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-19 - [LD 34] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 63
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Tax Liability Changes & Definitions
Title
Tax Liability Changes & Definitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-18 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-03 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-19 | House | [LD 34] Signed by the Governor - Chapter 63 |
2017-02-19 | Senate | [LD 34] Passed Senate (40-0) |
2017-02-17 | Senate | [LD 32] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-16 | Senate | [LD 31] Referred to Senate Finance |
2017-02-16 | Senate | [LD 31] Do pass committee report adopted |
2017-02-07 | Senate | [LD 22] Referred to Senate Corporations & Transportation |
2017-02-07 | Senate | [LD 22] Assigned to Senate Corporations & Transportation and then to Senate Finance |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Passed House (67-0) |
2017-01-26 | House | [LD 10] Floor amendment adopted |
2017-01-24 | House | [LD 8] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2017-01-21 | House | [LD 5] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |