NM HB42 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-28 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 7 - Feb. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 28 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-28 - Signed by Governor - Chapter 7 - Feb. 28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public Project Revolving Fund Projects
Title
Public Project Revolving Fund Projects
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - House Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-28 | House | Signed by Governor - Chapter 7 - Feb. 28 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Passed in the Senate - Y:27 N:0 |
2022-02-15 | Senate | SCONC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Sent to SCONC - Referrals: SCONC |
2022-02-10 | House | Passed in the House of Representatives - Y:63 N:0 |
2022-02-07 | House | HAFC: Reported by committee with Do Pass recommendation with amendment(s) |
2022-01-24 | House | Referred to: HAFC |
2022-01-24 | House | Bill falls within the purview of a 30 day session and ordered printed |
2022-01-19 | House | Not Printed |
2022-01-18 | House | Sent to HPREF - Referrals: HPREF |