NM HB503 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 55] h and then to cncrd Signed by one or both houses (Apr.3) Ch.158.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 55] h and then to cncrd Signed by one or both houses (Apr.3) Ch.158.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Go bond negotiated sales & interest rates
Title
Go bond negotiated sales & interest rates
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-06 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 55] h and then to cncrd Signed by one or both houses (Apr.3) Ch.158. |
2013-03-16 | Senate | [LD 47] Passed Senate (37-0) |
2013-03-16 | Senate | [LD 47] Floor amendment adopted |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-27 | Senate | [LD 32] Referred to Senate Finance |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Passed House (68-0) |
2013-03-05 | House | [LD 36] Do pass, as amended, committee report adopted |
2013-02-19 | House | [LD 26] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-02-19 | House | [LD 26] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-02-11 | House | [LD 20] Referred to House Taxation & Revenue |
2013-02-11 | House | [LD 20] Assigned to House Taxation & Revenue and then to House Judiciary |