NM HB57 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] w/drn API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-04 - [LD 46] w/drn API.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Public employees returning to work
Title
Public employees returning to work
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-04 | [LD 46] w/drn API. | |
2011-02-26 | [LD 40] DP-SFC | |
2011-02-12 | [LD 26] SPAC/SFC-SPAC | |
2011-02-18 | [LD 32] DP- PASSED/H (51-14) | |
2011-02-17 | [LD 31] w/drn h/calendar- re-ref HJC- HJC | |
2011-02-13 | [LD 27] DP | |
2011-02-08 | [LD 22] w/drn h/calendar- ref HJC-HJC | |
2011-02-07 | [LD 21] DP | |
2011-01-26 | [LD 9] DP-HHGAC | |
2011-01-19 | [LD 2] HLC/HHGAC-HLC | |
2011-01-18 | [LD 1] HPREF |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=H&legtype=B&legno=57&year=11 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/11%20Regular/bills/house/HB0057.pdf |