NM HB570 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 47] Passed Senate (41-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.3) Ch.152.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-03-16 - [LD 47] Passed Senate (41-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.3) Ch.152.
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Sex offender tiers, registration & info
Title
Sex offender tiers, registration & info
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-16 - Senate - Senate Final Passages (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - House Final Passages (Y: 69 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-16 | Senate | [LD 47] Passed Senate (41-0) Signed by one or both houses (Apr.3) Ch.152. |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-15 | Senate | [LD 44] Referred to Senate Judiciary |
2013-03-16 | House | [LD 50] Passed House (69-1) |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Committee substitute and then to Do pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Do not pass committee report adopted |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] Referred to House Judiciary |
2013-03-08 | House | [LD 39] WITHOUT RECOMMENDATION committee report adopted |
2013-02-13 | House | [LD 22] Referred to House Consumer & Public Affairs |
2013-02-13 | House | [LD 22] Assigned to House Consumer & Public Affairs and then to House Judiciary |