NM SB182 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - [LD 20] s/cncrd SGND (Mar.10) Ch.105 (partial veto).
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-15 - [LD 20] s/cncrd SGND (Mar.10) Ch.105 (partial veto).
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Capital outlay reversions for solvency
Title
Capital outlay reversions for solvency
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-15 | [LD 20] s/cncrd SGND (Mar.10) Ch.105 (partial veto). | |
2010-02-12 | [LD 19] DP/a-HAFC- DP/a - PASSED/H (43-25) | |
2010-02-05 | [LD 14] HTRC/HAFC-HTRC | |
2010-01-28 | [LD 8] DP/a - PASSED/S (36-4) | |
2010-01-27 | [LD 7] DNP-CS/DP - ref SFC-SFC | |
2010-01-20 | [LD 2] SCC/SFC-SCC-germane-SFC |