NM SJR15 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-18 - [LD 25] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 7 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-18 - [LD 25] Action postponed indefinitely
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Los lunas property transfer
Title
Los lunas property transfer
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-18 | [LD 25] Action postponed indefinitely | |
2012-02-18 | [LD 25] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-02-17 | [LD 24] Referred to House Voters & Elections | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Passed Senate (33-0) | |
2012-02-07 | [LD 16] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Referred to Senate Finance | |
2012-01-30 | [LD 10] Do pass committee report adopted | |
2012-01-24 | [LD 6] Referred to Senate Rules | |
2012-01-24 | [LD 6] Assigned to Senate Rules and then to Senate Finance |
New Mexico State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.nmlegis.gov/lcs/legislation.aspx?chamber=S&legtype=JR&legno=15&year=12 |
Text | https://www.nmlegis.gov/Sessions/12%20Regular/resolutions/senate/SJR15.pdf |