NM SJR5 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-19 - [LD 24] PASSED/H (51-10) SGND (C.A. 2).
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-19 - [LD 24] PASSED/H (51-10) SGND (C.A. 2).
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extend county official term limits, ca
Title
Extend county official term limits, ca
Sponsors
Sen. Pete Campos [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-19 | [LD 24] PASSED/H (51-10) SGND (C.A. 2). | |
2010-02-12 | [LD 19] HHGAC/HVEC-HHGAC- DP-HVEC- DP | |
2010-02-08 | [LD 15] DP - PASSED/S (27-14) | |
2010-01-25 | [LD 5] DP-SJC | |
2010-01-19 | [LD 1] SRC/SJC-SRC |