NV AB148 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-24 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to criminal procedure; revising provisions governing plea agreements; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions governing plea agreements. (BDR 14-121)
Sponsors
Rep. Ozzie Fumo [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-24 | Assembly | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.2, no further action allowed.) |
2019-04-18 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To Chief Clerk's desk. |
2019-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 389.) Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. To printer. |
2019-04-16 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-02-18 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-02-15 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |