NV AB348 | 2019 | 80th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 571.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-13 - Chapter 571.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to occupational safety and health; requiring certain medical facilities to develop and carry out a plan for the prevention of workplace violence and report incidents of workplace violence to the Division of Industrial Relations of the Department of Business and Industry; prohibiting such a medical facility from taking certain actions against an employee or other provider of care who seeks the assistance of a public safety agency in response to workplace violence or who reports workplace violence; requiring such a medical facility to maintain certain records; requiring the Division to publish an annual report concerning workplace violence at such medical facilities; revising provisions relating to staffing at certain health care facilities; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Makes various changes related to working conditions at certain medical facilities. (BDR 53-843)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 13 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 29 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Chapter 571. |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2019-06-07 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | Senate Amendment No. 1109 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | To printer. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 13, Nays: 8.) |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 1109.) |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Taken from Secretary's desk. Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To committee. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on Secretary's desk. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Read second time. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-05-20 | Senate | From committee: Without recommendation. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | In Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 29, Nays: 12, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2019-04-23 | Assembly | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 603.) To printer. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2019-04-22 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2019-03-20 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |