NV AB452 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter 465.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Chapter 465.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to offenders; requiring the Director of the Department of Corrections to adopt regulations establishing and governing a program for the visitation of offenders; requiring a warden or manager to provide certain notice regarding the cancellation of visitation; establishing the Office of the Ombudsperson for Offenders; establishing the powers and duties of the Ombudsperson; providing that an offender has the right to receive visitors in person; making an appropriation; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to offenders. (BDR 16-315)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 16 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Assembly | Chapter 465. |
2023-06-14 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. |
2023-06-09 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | Senate Amendment Nos. 675 and 964 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | To printer. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 16, Nays: 5.) |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 964.) |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2023-06-04 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Exemption effective. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Taken from General File. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 675.) |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To committee. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-04-19 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 28, Nays: 14.) To Senate. |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2023-04-14 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-03-29 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-27 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |