NV AB506 | 2013 | 77th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 549.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-13 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 549.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing taxation. (BDR 32-1246)
Title
Revises provisions governing taxation. (BDR 32-1246)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-13 | Assembly | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 549. |
2013-06-10 | Assembly | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2013-06-07 | Assembly | To enrollment. |
2013-06-03 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 20, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2013-06-03 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2013-06-02 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Revenue and Economic Development. To committee. |
2013-06-02 | Senate | In Senate. |
2013-06-02 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 41, Nays: None, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2013-06-01 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2013-06-01 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2013-06-01 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2013-05-31 | Assembly | From printer. To committee. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Taxation. To printer. |
2013-05-30 | Assembly | Waiver granted effective: May 29, 2013. |