NV AB96 | 2011 | 76th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-16 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-16 - (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing the admissibility of psychological or psychiatric evidence. (BDR 4-558)
Title
Revises provisions governing the admissibility of psychological or psychiatric evidence. (BDR 4-558)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-16 | (Pursuant to Joint Standing Rule No. 14.3.1, no further action allowed.) | |
2011-02-07 | Read first time. To committee. | |
2011-01-26 | From printer. | |
2011-01-25 | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Judiciary. To printer. |
Nevada State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/76th2011/Reports/history.cfm?ID=219 |
Text | http://www.leg.state.nv.us/Session/76th2011/Bills/AB/AB96.pdf |