NV SB239 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - No further consideration.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on June 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-05 - No further consideration.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to health care; revising provisions concerning medical certificates of death relating to a person who self-administers a medication that is designed to end his or her life; authorizing a physician or advanced practice registered nurse to prescribe a medication that is designed to end the life of a patient under certain circumstances; prohibiting persons other than a patient from administering a medication that is designed to end the life of the patient; imposing requirements on certain providers of health care and health care facilities relating to the records of a patient who requests a medication that is designed to end his or her life; providing immunity to certain providers of health care and health care facilities that take certain actions relating to prescribing or dispensing a medication that is designed to end the life of a patient; authorizing the owner or operator of a health care facility to prohibit certain persons from providing certain services relating to a medication that is designed to end the life of a patient; prohibiting a person from conditioning provisions of a will, contract, agreement or policy of life insurance on the request for or acquisition or administration of a medication that is designed to end the life of the person; prohibiting a person from denying benefits under a policy of life insurance to or imposing additional charges against a policyholder or beneficiary because the insured requested or revoked a request for a medication that is designed to end the life of the person; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Establishes provisions governing the prescribing, dispensing and administering of medication designed to end the life of a patient. (BDR 40-677)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-19 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 11 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-05 | Senate | No further consideration. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Made Special Order of Business for June 5, 2023, in the next minute. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Vetoed by the Governor. Returned to Senate with Governor's veto message. |
2023-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-05-29 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 715 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2023-05-25 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 23, Nays: 19.) To Senate. |
2023-05-24 | Assembly | From printer. To reengrossment. Reengrossed. Second reprint. |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 715.) To printer. |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To committee. |
2023-04-20 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. Preamble adopted. (Yeas: 11, Nays: 10.) To Assembly. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2023-04-18 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 84.) To printer. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-17 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-09 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Health and Human Services. To printer. |