NV SB274 | 2023 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 535.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 16 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-16 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 535.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT relating to industrial insurance; requiring the Administrator of the Division of Industrial Relations of the Department of Business and Industry to post certain information on the Internet website of the Division; increasing the amount of certain penalties for certain violations of the Nevada Industrial Insurance Act or the Nevada Occupational Diseases Act; revising provisions relating to the imposition and payment of benefit penalties; revising certain requirements for certain investigations conducted by the Administrator; and providing other matters properly relating thereto.
Title
Revises provisions relating to industrial insurance. (BDR 53-946)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-05-26 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 14 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-16 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 535. |
2023-06-08 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Assembly Amendment No. 997 concurred in. To enrollment. |
2023-06-05 | Senate | In Senate. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | To Senate. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | To reengrossment.Reengrossed. Third reprint. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | To printer. From printer. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 42, Nays: None.) |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 997.) Dispensed with reprinting. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | Placed on General File. |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | Taken from Chief Clerk's desk. |
2023-06-04 | Assembly | Placed on Chief Clerk's desk. |
2023-06-04 | Assembly | Taken from General File. |
2023-06-03 | Assembly | Read second time. |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File for next legislative day. |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | Taken from Second Reading File. |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2023-05-29 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To committee. |
2023-05-29 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | From printer. To re-engrossment. Re-engrossed. Second reprint. To Assembly. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | To printer. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Passed, as amended. Title approved, as amended. (Yeas: 14, Nays: 6, Excused: 1.) |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Reprinting dispensed with. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Read third time. Amended. (Amend. No. 736.) |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Placed on General File. |
2023-05-26 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | From printer. To engrossment. Engrossed. First reprint. To committee. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Re-referred to Committee on Finance. Exemption effective. To printer. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Read second time. Amended. (Amend. No. 242.) Taken from General File. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Notice of eligibility for exemption. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Placed on Second Reading File. |
2023-04-24 | Senate | From committee: Amend, and do pass as amended. |
2023-03-15 | Senate | From printer. To committee. |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Commerce and Labor. To printer. |