NV SB3 | 2017 | 79th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 353.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 4 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-04 - Approved by the Governor. Chapter 353.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Revises provisions governing the Breakfast After the Bell Program that provides breakfast to certain pupils at public schools. (BDR 34-135)
Title
Revises provisions governing the Breakfast After the Bell Program that provides breakfast to certain pupils at public schools. (BDR 34-135)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-02 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-29 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-05-11 - Senate - Senate Final Passage (Y: 19 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-04 | Senate | Approved by the Governor. Chapter 353. |
2017-05-30 | Senate | Enrolled and delivered to Governor. |
2017-05-29 | Senate | In Senate. To enrollment. |
2017-05-26 | Assembly | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 38, Nays: 3, Excused: 1.) To Senate. |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | Declared an emergency measure under the Constitution. |
2017-05-25 | Assembly | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | Read first time. Referred to Committee on Ways and Means. To committee. |
2017-05-15 | Assembly | In Assembly. |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Read third time. Passed. Title approved. (Yeas: 19, Nays: 1, Excused: 1.) To Assembly. |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for Tuesday, May 9, 2017. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Taken from General File. Placed on General File for next legislative day. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Read third time. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Read second time. |
2017-05-01 | Senate | From committee: Do pass. |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Notice of exemption. |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Read first time. To committee. |
2016-11-23 | Senate | From printer. |
2016-11-15 | Senate | Prefiled. Referred to Committee on Finance. To printer. |