NY A00901 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-6)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - substituted by s1267a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-03 - substituted by s1267a
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires a utilization review agent to follow certain rules when establishing a step therapy protocol; requires that the protocol accepts any attestation submitted by the insured's health care professional stating that a required drug has failed as prima facie evidence that the required drug has failed.
Title
Requires a utilization review agent to follow certain rules when establishing a step therapy protocol; requires that the protocol accepts any attestation submitted by the insured's health care professional stating that a required drug has failed as prima facie evidence that the required drug has failed.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-03 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-05-22 - Assembly - Assembly Insurance Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 24 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-03 | Assembly | substituted by s1267a |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | rules report cal.299 |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | reported |
2024-06-03 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2024-05-22 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2024-05-15 | Assembly | print number 901a |
2024-05-15 | Assembly | amend and recommit to insurance |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
2023-01-11 | Assembly | referred to insurance |
Same As/Similar To
S01267 (Same As) 2024-06-05 - returned to senate