NY A01204 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-18 - approval memo.59
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on December 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-12-18 - approval memo.59
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to HIV post-exposure prophylaxis and other health care services for sexual assault victims.
Title
Relates to HIV post-exposure prophylaxis and other health care services for sexual assault victims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-18 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 144 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-06-12 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-12-18 | Senate | approval memo.59 |
2019-12-18 | Senate | signed chap.681 |
2019-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2019-06-18 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-18 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-18 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1536 |
2019-06-18 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S2279A |
2019-06-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.236 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | rules report cal.236 |
2019-06-13 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-12 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | print number 1204a |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2019-02-11 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-01-29 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-01-14 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S02279 (Same As) 2019-12-18 - approval memo.59