NY A01234 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 17 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-05-15 - RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expands the definition of crops, livestock and livestock products to include cannabis.
Title
Expands the definition of crops, livestock and livestock products to include cannabis.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-17 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 141 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-03-28 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-15 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-05-15 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2024-05-15 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.230 |
2024-05-15 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S1752 |
2024-01-16 | Senate | REFERRED TO AGRICULTURE |
2024-01-16 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2024-01-16 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.39 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2024-01-03 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2023-04-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-03-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.101 |
2023-03-28 | Assembly | reported |
2023-02-27 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-01-13 | Assembly | referred to agriculture |
Same As/Similar To
S01752 (Same As) 2024-05-15 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1234