NY A01771 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - delivered to secretary of state
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-08-04 - delivered to secretary of state
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to limitations on local indebtedness; removes school districts from those not permitted to contract indebtedness.
Title
Relates to limitations on local indebtedness; removes school districts from those not permitted to contract indebtedness.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-02-06 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-04 | Assembly | delivered to secretary of state |
2023-03-29 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-03-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-03-29 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.503 |
2023-03-29 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5025 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO JUDICIARY |
2023-03-13 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-03-13 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.47 |
2023-03-09 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2023-03-08 | Assembly | reported |
2023-02-24 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2023-02-22 | Assembly | print number 1771a |
2023-02-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2023-02-06 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-02-03 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2023-01-23 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2023-01-20 | Assembly | referred to judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
S05025 (Same As) 2023-03-29 - SUBSTITUTED BY A1771A