NY A02631 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-13 - print number 2631a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-06-13 - print number 2631a
Pending: Assembly Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Creates the lupus research enhancement program; creates the lupus research enhancement fund.
Title
Creates the lupus research enhancement program; creates the lupus research enhancement fund.
Sponsors
Asm. Crystal Peoples-Stokes [D] | Asm. Anthony Brindisi [D] | Asm. Matthew Titone [D] | Asm. Fred Thiele [D] |
Asm. John McDonald [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-13 | Assembly | print number 2631a |
2016-06-13 | Assembly | amend and recommit to ways and means |
2016-01-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to health |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2015-01-20 | Assembly | referred to health |
Same As/Similar To
S05218 (Same As) 2016-06-14 - referred to ways and means