NY A02897 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-3)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school districts to provide instructional programming and services in reading and literacy which are evidence based and aligned with state standards; requires teachers in grades pre-K through five to attend professional development courses in reading education.
Title
Requires school districts to provide instructional programming and services in reading and literacy which are evidence based and aligned with state standards; requires teachers in grades pre-K through five to attend professional development courses in reading education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to education |
2023-12-11 | Assembly | print number 2897a |
2023-12-11 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2023-02-01 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S05480 (Same As) 2024-01-04 - PRINT NUMBER 5480A