NY A03117 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to energy
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-03 - referred to energy
Pending: Assembly Energy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the design of uniform standards and conditions relating to the construction and operation of major renewable energy facilities and the review of applications for permits to develop such facilities.
Title
Relates to the design of uniform standards and conditions relating to the construction and operation of major renewable energy facilities and the review of applications for permits to develop such facilities.
Sponsors
Asm. Donna Lupardo [D] | Asm. Carrie Woerner [D] | Asm. Albert Stirpe [D] | Asm. William Colton [D] |
Asm. Christopher Tague [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to energy |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | print number 3117c |
2023-06-06 | Assembly | amend and recommit to energy |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | print number 3117b |
2023-06-02 | Assembly | amend and recommit to energy |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | print number 3117a |
2023-04-17 | Assembly | amend and recommit to energy |
2023-02-02 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S01793 (Same As) 2024-02-06 - REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE