NY A03780 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-04 - ordered to third reading cal.148
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 3 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-01-04 - ordered to third reading cal.148
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires gas and electric utilities to make available to landlords or lessors, upon request of prospective tenants or lessees, information concerning gas and electric charges incurred for residential rental premises; provides that such information shall be furnished without any charge or fee.
Title
Requires gas and electric utilities to make available to landlords or lessors, upon request of prospective tenants or lessees, information concerning gas and electric charges incurred for residential rental premises; provides that such information shall be furnished without any charge or fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-03 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 139 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-01-04 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.148 |
2012-01-04 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2012-01-04 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2011-05-03 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2011-05-03 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2011-05-03 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2011-03-21 | Assembly | amended on third reading 3780a |
2011-02-24 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.59 |
2011-02-15 | Assembly | reported |
2011-01-27 | Assembly | referred to energy |
Same As/Similar To
S01878 (Same As) 2012-03-13 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES