NY S01878 | 2011-2012 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-13 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-13 - COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires gas and electric utilities to make available to landlords or lessors, upon request of prospective tenants or lessees, information concerning gas and electric charges incurred for residential rental premises; provides that such information shall be furnished without any charge or fee.
Title
Requires gas and electric utilities to make available to landlords or lessors, upon request of prospective tenants or lessees, information concerning gas and electric charges incurred for residential rental premises; provides that such information shall be furnished without any charge or fee.
Sponsors
Sen. Adriano Espaillat [D] | Sen. Shirley Huntley [D] | Sen. Liz Krueger [D] | Sen. Velmanette Montgomery [D] |
Sen. Bill Perkins [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | Senate | COMMITTEE DISCHARGED AND COMMITTED TO RULES |
2012-03-13 | Senate | NOTICE OF COMMITTEE CONSIDERATION - REQUESTED |
2012-01-04 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2011-03-16 | Senate | PRINT NUMBER 1878A |
2011-03-16 | Senate | AMEND AND RECOMMIT TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
2011-01-13 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENERGY AND TELECOMMUNICATIONS |
Same As/Similar To
A03780 (Same As) 2012-01-04 - ordered to third reading cal.148