NY A04080 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-09 - signed chap.666
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on December 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-09 - signed chap.666
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to granting salary protection for provisional and temporary employees.
Title
Relates to granting salary protection for provisional and temporary employees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-24 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-06-07 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Governmental Employees Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-09 | Assembly | signed chap.666 |
2022-12-02 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-24 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-24 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-24 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1255 |
2022-05-24 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8210 |
2022-01-26 | Senate | REFERRED TO FINANCE |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-01-26 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.138 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-06-07 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.427 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | rules report cal.427 |
2021-06-07 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-02-01 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S08210 (Same As) 2022-05-24 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4080