NY A04942 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1)
Status: Passed on October 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - signed chap.549
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-1)
Status: Passed on October 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - signed chap.549
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the SUNY and CUNY boards of trustees and boards of trustees of community colleges to establish a policy for the awarding of posthumous degrees; requires such policy to waive any remaining credits for enrolled matriculated students who die and would otherwise have been eligible for graduation had they been able to complete their academic career.
Title
Requires the SUNY and CUNY boards of trustees and boards of trustees of community colleges to establish a policy for the awarding of posthumous degrees; requires such policy to waive any remaining credits for enrolled matriculated students who die and would otherwise have been eligible for graduation had they been able to complete their academic career.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-09 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-09 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 140 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-25 | Assembly | signed chap.549 |
2023-10-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-06-09 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-09 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-09 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.809 |
2023-06-09 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S5355A |
2023-06-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.696 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | rules report cal.696 |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-08 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-31 | Assembly | reference changed to ways and means |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | print number 4942b |
2023-05-26 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | print number 4942a |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | amend and recommit to higher education |
2023-02-27 | Assembly | referred to higher education |
Same As/Similar To
S05355 (Same As) 2023-06-09 - SUBSTITUTED BY A4942B