NY A04944 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - VETOED MEMO.130
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on November 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-11-08 - VETOED MEMO.130
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to legalizing, validating, ratifying and confirming a transportation contract of the Cold Spring Harbor central school district.
Title
Relates to legalizing, validating, ratifying and confirming a transportation contract of the Cold Spring Harbor central school district.
Sponsors
Asm. Steve Stern [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-30 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-15 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 57 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Vote (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Vote (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-11-08 | Assembly | VETOED MEMO.130 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-04 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-04 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-04 | Senate | ordered to third reading cal.512 |
2019-06-04 | Senate | substituted for a4944 |
2019-05-15 | Senate | referred to education |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-05-15 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2019-05-08 | Assembly | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2019-05-07 | Assembly | 1ST REPORT CAL.604 |
2019-04-09 | Assembly | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2019-06-04 | Assembly | substituted by s2977 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.512 |
2019-05-30 | Assembly | reported |
2019-05-21 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-02-05 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S02977 (Same As) 2019-11-08 - VETOED MEMO.130
S07037 (Same As) 2020-11-27 - tabled
A08896 (Same As) 2020-11-27 - tabled
S07037 (Same As) 2020-11-27 - tabled
A08896 (Same As) 2020-11-27 - tabled