NY A05496 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-05 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 24 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-05 - opinion referred to judiciary
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for the filling of vacancies in the office of lieutenant-governor by appointment of the governor subject to confirmation by majority vote in the senate and majority vote in the assembly.
Title
Provides for the filling of vacancies in the office of lieutenant-governor by appointment of the governor subject to confirmation by majority vote in the senate and majority vote in the assembly.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-05 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2016-01-13 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2016-01-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
2015-03-18 | Assembly | opinion referred to judiciary |
2015-02-25 | Assembly | to attorney-general for opinion |
2015-02-24 | Assembly | referred to governmental operations |
Same As/Similar To
S02726 (Same As) 2016-04-06 - OPINION REFERRED TO JUDICIARY