NY A05541 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Vetoed on December 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-09 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on December 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-12-09 - tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes environmental standards for ambient lead and lead contamination in soils and on floors and window sills.
Title
Establishes environmental standards for ambient lead and lead contamination in soils and on floors and window sills.
Sponsors
Asm. Steven Englebright [D] | Asm. Phillip Steck [D] | Asm. Daniel O'Donnell [D] | Asm. Judy Griffin [D] |
Asm. Steven Otis [D] | Asm. Nader Sayegh [D] | Asm. Yuh-line Niou [D] | Asm. Anna Kelles [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-17 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 146 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-09 | Assembly | tabled |
2022-12-09 | Assembly | vetoed memo.87 |
2022-12-06 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-05-17 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-17 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2022-05-17 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1104 |
2022-05-17 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S8050A |
2022-04-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-04-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | amended on third reading 5541b |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.178 |
2021-03-18 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.185 |
2021-03-16 | Assembly | reported |
2021-03-12 | Assembly | print number 5541a |
2021-03-12 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to environmental conservation |
2021-02-19 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S08050 (Same As) 2022-05-17 - SUBSTITUTED BY A5541B