NY A06338 | 2017-2018 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-09 - print number 6338a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-09 - print number 6338a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to establishing regional secondary schools.
Title
Relates to establishing regional secondary schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-09 | Assembly | print number 6338a |
2018-02-09 | Assembly | amend and recommit to education |
2018-01-03 | Assembly | referred to education |
2017-03-02 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S04823 (Same As) 2018-02-12 - PRINT NUMBER 4823A