NY A07114 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-5)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - print number 7114c
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-16 - print number 7114c
Pending: Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to bioheating fuel requirements; allows B100 or B99 biofuel and R100 or R99 renewable fuel to be used to blend with or replace fossil heating oil in order to create bioheating fuel.
Title
Relates to bioheating fuel requirements; allows B100 or B99 biofuel and R100 or R99 renewable fuel to be used to blend with or replace fossil heating oil in order to create bioheating fuel.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-16 | Assembly | print number 7114c |
2024-02-16 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
2023-12-22 | Assembly | print number 7114b |
2023-12-22 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | print number 7114a |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | amend and recommit to environmental conservation |
2023-05-11 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S05817 (Same As) 2024-06-07 - COMMITTED TO RULES