NY A07246 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - signed chap.578
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on October 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-10-25 - signed chap.578
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to changing the time for calculating amounts for awards of grants to support preservation and/or conservation of library research materials from being calculated for each state fiscal year, to each academic year.
Title
Relates to changing the time for calculating amounts for awards of grants to support preservation and/or conservation of library research materials from being calculated for each state fiscal year, to each academic year.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Libraries And Education Technology Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 145 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-06-01 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Libraries And Education Technology Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-25 | Assembly | signed chap.578 |
2023-10-13 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2023-06-07 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2023-06-07 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2023-06-07 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1216 |
2023-06-07 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S6938A |
2023-06-05 | Senate | REFERRED TO RULES |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.545 |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | rules report cal.545 |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | reported |
2023-06-01 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2023-05-23 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2023-05-15 | Assembly | referred to libraries and education technology |
Same As/Similar To
S06938 (Same As) 2023-06-07 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7246