NY A07348 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-6)
Status: Introduced on May 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-27 - print number 7348a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-27 - print number 7348a
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extends certain provisions authorizing a school district to provide student transportation based upon patterns of actual ridership until January 1, 2019.
Title
Extends certain provisions authorizing a school district to provide student transportation based upon patterns of actual ridership until January 1, 2019.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-27 | Assembly | print number 7348a |
2014-03-27 | Assembly | amend (t) and recommit to education |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | referred to education |
2013-05-14 | Assembly | referred to education |
Same As/Similar To
S03141 (Same As) 2014-05-19 - referred to education