NY S03141 | 2013-2014 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-19 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 29 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-05-19 - referred to education
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Makes permanent certain provisions authorizing a school district to provide student transportation based upon patterns of actual ridership.
Title
Makes permanent certain provisions authorizing a school district to provide student transportation based upon patterns of actual ridership.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-29 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 61 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-19 | Assembly | referred to education |
2014-05-19 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2014-05-19 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2014-05-12 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2014-05-07 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2014-05-06 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.535 |
2014-03-11 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2014-01-08 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2014-01-08 | Assembly | died in assembly |
2013-05-29 | Assembly | referred to education |
2013-05-29 | Senate | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2013-05-29 | Senate | PASSED SENATE |
2013-05-23 | Senate | ADVANCED TO THIRD READING |
2013-05-22 | Senate | 2ND REPORT CAL. |
2013-05-21 | Senate | 1ST REPORT CAL.651 |
2013-02-12 | Senate | REPORTED AND COMMITTED TO FINANCE |
2013-01-30 | Senate | REFERRED TO EDUCATION |
Same As/Similar To
A07348 (Same As) 2014-03-27 - print number 7348a