NY A07373 | 2015-2016 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-28 - substituted by s4932
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-05-28 - substituted by s4932
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to injunctive relief in improper practice cases, in relation to extending the effectiveness of provisions contained therein.
Title
Relates to injunctive relief in improper practice cases, in relation to extending the effectiveness of provisions contained therein.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-28 | Assembly | substituted by s4932 |
2015-05-21 | Assembly | advanced to third reading cal.446 |
2015-05-19 | Assembly | reported |
2015-05-06 | Assembly | referred to governmental employees |
Same As/Similar To
S04932 (Same As) 2015-06-30 - SIGNED CHAP.47