NY A07612 | 2023-2024 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-21 - held for consideration in economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-05-21 - held for consideration in economic development
Pending: Assembly Economic Development, Job Creation, Commerce and Industry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits the use of cannabis in public places, unless approved by the applicable local government.
Title
Prohibits the use of cannabis in public places, unless approved by the applicable local government.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-05-21 - Assembly - Assembly Economic Development Committee: Held for Consideration (Y: 16 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-21 | Assembly | held for consideration in economic development |
2024-01-03 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
2023-05-25 | Assembly | referred to economic development |
Same As/Similar To
S07604 (Same As) 2024-05-06 - DEFEATED IN INVESTIGATIONS AND GOVERNMENT OPERATIONS