NY A07710 | 2021-2022 | General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - signed chap.243
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-30 - signed chap.243
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to the regulation of taking crabs, including minimum and maximum size limits, open and closed seasons including lunar closures, and a prohibition on the harvest of crabs in amplexus.
Title
Relates to the regulation of taking crabs, including minimum and maximum size limits, open and closed seasons including lunar closures, and a prohibition on the harvest of crabs in amplexus.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-01 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-05-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-05-24 - Assembly - Assembly Environmental Conservation Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-30 | Assembly | signed chap.243 |
2022-06-22 | Assembly | delivered to governor |
2022-06-01 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-06-01 | Senate | REPASSED SENATE |
2022-06-01 | Senate | 3RD READING CAL.1732 |
2022-06-01 | Senate | SUBSTITUTED FOR S9419 |
2022-05-31 | Senate | RECOMMITTED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | returned to senate |
2022-05-31 | Assembly | repassed assembly |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | amended on third reading 7710a |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | vote reconsidered - restored to third reading |
2022-05-24 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-05-24 | Assembly | recalled from senate |
2022-02-17 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2022-02-17 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2022-01-05 | Assembly | ordered to third reading cal.272 |
2022-01-05 | Senate | RETURNED TO ASSEMBLY |
2022-01-05 | Senate | DIED IN SENATE |
2021-05-25 | Senate | REFERRED TO ENVIRONMENTAL CONSERVATION |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | delivered to senate |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | passed assembly |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.153 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | rules report cal.153 |
2021-05-25 | Assembly | reported |
2021-05-24 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | referred to environmental conservation |
Same As/Similar To
S09419 (Same As) 2022-06-01 - SUBSTITUTED BY A7710A