NY A08082 | 2019-2020 | General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 26-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 30 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-22 - POCKET VETO - VETO.295
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 30 2019 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-22 - POCKET VETO - VETO.295
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Relates to wages and supplements for building service employees employed at certain properties held in the cooperative or condominium form of ownership receiving a tax abatement, affidavits certifying the payment of prevailing wages to building service workers are made public record and may be produced before a court or administrative tribunal.
Title
Relates to wages and supplements for building service employees employed at certain properties held in the cooperative or condominium form of ownership receiving a tax abatement, affidavits certifying the payment of prevailing wages to building service workers are made public record and may be produced before a court or administrative tribunal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor Vote - Final Passage (Y: 44 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Vote (Y: 12 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-19 - Assembly - Assembly Rules Committee: Favorable (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Codes Committee: Favorable refer to committee Ways and Means (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Ways And Means Committee: Favorable refer to committee Rules (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Favorable refer to committee Codes (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-01-22 | Assembly | POCKET VETO - VETO.295 |
2019-12-30 | Senate | DELIVERED TO GOVERNOR |
2019-06-20 | Senate | returned to senate |
2019-06-20 | Senate | passed assembly |
2019-06-20 | Senate | ordered to third reading rules cal.609 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | substituted for a8082 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | referred to ways and means |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | DELIVERED TO ASSEMBLY |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | PASSED SENATE |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ORDERED TO THIRD READING CAL.1788 |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | PRINT NUMBER 6219A |
2019-06-03 | Assembly | AMEND (T) AND RECOMMIT TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | REFERRED TO LOCAL GOVERNMENT |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | substituted by s6219a |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | ordered to third reading rules cal.609 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | rules report cal.609 |
2019-06-19 | Assembly | reported |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to rules |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | reported referred to ways and means |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | reported referred to codes |
2019-05-31 | Assembly | referred to labor |
Same As/Similar To
S06219 (Same As) 2021-01-22 - POCKET VETO - VETO.295